+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 23.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On January 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2599.) (January 15).
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 15.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 21, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 15, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor