+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 710, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6080.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5957.)
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 29).
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2943.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2916.) (January 19).
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 19.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 13.
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2016: Unfinished Business SB745 Hueso Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2016: SB 745 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GIPSON
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 26
August 19, 2016: SB 745 Hueso Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB745 Hueso
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 19, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
January 13, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor