+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1850.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2486.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 668.) (April 23).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 15, 2013: Unfinished Business SB745 Committee on T. & H. (DeSaulnier) Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 8, 2013: SB 745 T. & H. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 19, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd SB745 Committee on T. & H. (DeSaulnier)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 3
April 23, 2013: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (10)
Committee on Transportation and Housing
Type:
Primary Sponsor