+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and G.O.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 1168.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 640.) (April 23).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 563.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and G.O.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 7, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
July 3, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB741 Cannella Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 23, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization.
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor