+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 522, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 2381.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 3187.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2948.)
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 30).
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reconsideration granted.
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1108.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 30).
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2013: Unfinished Supp 1 SB740 Padilla Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2013: SB 740 Padilla Third Reading Urgency By BRADFORD
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 3
August 12, 2013: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 6
July 1, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB740 Padilla Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor