+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1248.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 813.) (April 29).
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
July 6, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
July 6, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB736 Vidak
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor