+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 824.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor