+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (46)
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 814, Statutes of 2022.
On August 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4897.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 5627.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 5509.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ting.
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reconsideration granted.
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 28. Page 3166.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ting.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1378.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1202.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 778.) (April 13).
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 6 hearing postponed by committee.
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
- Read first time.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 18, 2022: Unfinished Business SB731 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2022: SB 731 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 14
September 10, 2021: SB 731 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 17
June 29, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB731 Durazo et al.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor