+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2621.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 26. Page 3062.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On June 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 748.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 423.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10.
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 10, 2021: Unfinished Business SB73 Wiener et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
September 9, 2021: SB 73 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Carrillo
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 12
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
June 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 12, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB73 Wiener et al.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
March 9, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1