+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 225, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2143.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Urgency clause adopted.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2521.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On August 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 723.) (April 22).
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
August 24, 2015: Unfinished Business SB725 Hancock Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2015: Unfinished Business SB725 Hancock Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 20, 2015: SB 725 Hancock Third Reading Urgency By O'DONNELL
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
July 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB725 Hancock
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor