+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 652, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3203.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 hearing postponed by committee.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1334.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1189.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 829.) (April 25).
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2017: SB 724 Lara Senate Third Reading By CALDERON
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
July 10, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB724 Lara
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor