+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- January 9 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 4021.) Reconsideration granted.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 9.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 9, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
January 9, 2018: [Second] hearing set for [01-09-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor