+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 496, Statutes of 2021.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2684.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 421.) (March 9).
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
- Read first time.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (3)
September 2, 2021: SB 721 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
April 29, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB721 Hueso et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 9, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor