+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died at Desk.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2035.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2032.)
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 891.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Corrected May 9).
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2013: SB 72 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 25
May 13, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB72 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor