+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and V.A.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor