+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 735, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2585.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2895.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1347.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1201.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 817.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB716 McGuire et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2021: SB 716 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia
- Yeas: 80
July 1, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: Special Consent SB716
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor