+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 6168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 6200.)
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5112.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 7083.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 29).
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6549.)
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
- Assembly Rule 78 suspended.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 955.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 914.) (May 1).
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2018: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB715 Delgado Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
August 31, 2018: SB 715 Delgado Senate Third Reading By CALDERON
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 9
August 24, 2018: SB 715 Newman Senate Third Reading By CALDERON Amend By CERVANTES Set #1
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 6
June 20, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB715 Newman
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor