+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 864, Statutes of 2024.
On September 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 5738.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 5699.)
On August 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5566.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On August 28, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 6711.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
On August 7, 2024 in the Assembly:
- August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 1).
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On July 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1401.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 18).
On May 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 895.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 572.) (March 29).
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2024: Unfinished Business SB707 Newman et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 8
August 29, 2024: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
August 28, 2024: SB 707 Newman Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 7
July 1, 2024: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
May 31, 2023: Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Newman et al.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 8
May 18, 2023: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 8, 2023: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
March 29, 2023: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2