+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 19. Page 5398.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On June 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Kalra.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19).
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on INS. and L. & E.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1110.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
- Read first time.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
June 16, 2022: SB 700 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Kalra Amend By REYES Set #1
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 12
August 19, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
June 24, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 17, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB700 Durazo
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 19, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor