+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 928, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 5563.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6107.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 4069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4043.) (January 16).
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 16.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3098.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 8.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 21, 2018: Unfinished Business SB70 Bates Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
July 5, 2018: SB 70 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
June 27, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB70 Bates
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
January 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
January 8, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor