+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 623, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5570.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 5538.)
On August 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 30.
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5448.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 6276.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 48. Noes 18. Page 5978.)
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Williams.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 28. Page 2976.)
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 14).
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and W., P., & W.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 880.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 779.) (April 27).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
August 31, 2016: Unfinished Business SB7 Wolk Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 3
August 30, 2016: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 11
August 19, 2016: SB 7 Wolk Motion to Reconsider By WILLIAMS
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 14
September 8, 2015: SB 7 Wolk Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 23
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife]
- Yeas: 7
June 17, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife]
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB7 Wolk
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
April 27, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor