+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 1365.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 343.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 333.) (February 25).
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 25.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 306.) (February 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 22.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (5)
May 10, 2021: SB 7 Atkins Third Reading Urgency By RIVAS, R.
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB7 Atkins et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 5
February 25, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
February 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor