+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 550, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4971.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4958.)
- Set for hearing August 28.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4888.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6493.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 17).
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 1090.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 750.) (April 30).
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2014: Unfinished Business SB699 Hill Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 28, 2014: From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
August 26, 2014: SB 699 Hill Senate Third Reading By GATTO
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
March 17, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB699 Hill
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 3
April 30, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor