+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 7. Page 2973.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2833.)
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 14).
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1090.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 759.) (April 30).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 10, 2013: Unfinished Business SB694 Correa Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
September 6, 2013: SB 694 Correa Senate Third Reading By WAGNER
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
August 14, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
June 26, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB694 Correa
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor