+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2845.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 3202.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P., & W.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 1310.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 25).
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 885.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 13, 2017: Unfinished Business SB693 Mendoza Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
September 12, 2017: SB 693 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C.
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 3
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB693 Mendoza
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 6
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 22, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor