+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Skinner.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2881.)
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 12).
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1182.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 853.) (May 7).
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 406.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB691 Hancock
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
May 7, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1