+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 882.) (May 8).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor