+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Stricken from file.
- Veto sustained.
On September 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On September 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2848.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 2. Page 3465.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On May 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 18).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 898.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 14, 2023: Unfinished Business SB686 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
September 13, 2023: SB 686 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Wendy Carrillo
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 13
September 1, 2023: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 26, 2023: Senate 3rd Reading SB686 Durazo et al.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 8
May 18, 2023: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 8, 2023: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor