+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 2613.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 3026.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
- Coauthors revised.
On August 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1380.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1200.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 755.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2021: Unfinished Business SB686 Glazer et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 6
September 9, 2021: SB 686 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Berman
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
June 30, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 2, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB686 Glazer
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 12, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1