+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2531.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 4, 2019: Unfinished Business SB681 Stern Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 3, 2019: SB 681 Stern Third Reading Urgency By Calderon
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
July 3, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB681 Stern
- Yeas: 38
April 10, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor