+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (41)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2642.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3159.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to the Assembly.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 2851.)
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2599.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 20).
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 842.) (April 19).
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
On March 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2021: Unfinished Business SB68 Becker et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
September 1, 2021: SB 68 Becker Senate Third Reading By Carrillo
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 26, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
May 28, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB68 Becker
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2