+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 30 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 hearing postponed by committee.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1262.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 744.) (April 18).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 28, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB679 Morrell
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor