+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 661, Statutes of 2022.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 5414.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 19. Page 6186.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1200.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 896.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 815.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
- Read first time.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB679 Kamlager et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 6
August 24, 2022: SB 679 Kamlager Senate Third Reading By Gipson
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 19
June 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB679 Kamlager et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor