+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HUM. S.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1234.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1200.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 23.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
- Read first time.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (7)
June 30, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 8
May 24, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB678 Rubio et al.
- Yeas: 40
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
March 23, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing]
- Yeas: 5