+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- January 21 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 19.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 13.
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 824.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 14 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor