+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (52)
On September 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2022.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5380.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 and 78 suspended.
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cervantes.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 5).
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and TRANS.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1200.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2. Page 943.) (April 27).
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and TRANS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
- Read first time.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (10)
August 31, 2022: SB 674 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Cervantes
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 4
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB674 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
August 8, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 5, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB674 Durazo et al.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor