+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 298, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5295.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Wood.
On August 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
On August 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- July 27 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 561.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 263.) (February 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 27.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2020: Unfinished Business SB67 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 30, 2020: SB 67 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By Wood
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
August 18, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
August 10, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
August 10, 2020: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
June 5, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
April 4, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB67 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor