+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor