+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Umberg.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1200.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 688.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
- Read first time.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11