+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 681, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 9. Page 2725.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 27).
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1158.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 821.) (April 28).
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 2, 2015: Unfinished Business SB664 Hertzberg Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 1, 2015: SB 664 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By LEVINE
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 9
August 27, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
June 30, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
June 30, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB664 Hertzberg
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor