+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 494, Statutes of 2021.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2587.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 2933.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1379.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 956.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
- Read first time.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB664 Allen Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
September 8, 2021: SB 664 Allen Senate Third Reading By Nazarian
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 7
July 6, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB664 Allen
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor