+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 2600.)
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 14.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
January 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor