+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2753.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3092.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13).
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1259.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 795.) (April 27).
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business SB660 Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 10, 2015: SB 660 Leno Senate Third Reading By RENDON
- Yeas: 80
July 13, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
July 13, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
June 2, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB660 Leno
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor