+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Veto sustained.
- Stricken from file.
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2518.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 2694.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
- Coauthors revised.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 22).
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 16).
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and JUD.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1233.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 755.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
September 8, 2021: Unfinished Business SB660 Newman et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
September 2, 2021: SB 660 Newman Senate Third Reading By Low
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 10
June 22, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
June 16, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB660 Newman
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 12, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor