+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor