+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2429.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3219.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1161.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1018.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2013: Unfinished Business SB654 Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
September 11, 2013: SB 654 Leno Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB654 Leno
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1