+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 390.)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 2, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor