+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 724, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3135.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2939.)
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 791.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 486.) (April 9).
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2013: Unfinished Business SB651 Pavley Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
September 10, 2013: SB 651 Pavley Senate Third Reading By YAMADA
- Yeas: 78
August 14, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
July 2, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 19
June 18, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 7
May 16, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd SB651 Pavley
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
April 9, 2013: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Health Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor