+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2275.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 2881.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11).
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 772.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 666.) (April 23).
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
September 10, 2013: Unfinished Business SB649 Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
September 4, 2013: SB 649 Leno Senate Third Reading By ATKINS
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 6
May 2, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB649 Leno
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor