+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 697.) (April 24).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 24, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor